Rustad v. Astrue

Defendant: SSA Noticing and Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: John Rustad
Case Number: 1:2012cv03117
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/1/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/1/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/16/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/14/13. (sgrim)
November 4, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner that plaintiff was not disabled is REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/04/14. (jhawk, )
November 5, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Final Judgment. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendant. ORDERED that plaintiff John Rustad is AWARDED his costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 11/05/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rustad v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rustad
Represented By: Chris R. Noel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]