West v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Rebecca D. West
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv03132
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/19/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/20/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/4/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/26/13. (sgrim)
June 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REMAND. Defendant's 18 Unopposed Motion for Remand for Further Proceedings is granted. This case is remanded pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Court directs the clerk to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/12/13.(mnfsl, )
June 13, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 19 Order. By Clerk on 6/13/13. (mnfsl, )
September 10, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Stipulated Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). Defendant shall pay $6,500.00 of attorney fees to Plaintiff pursuant to the EAJA. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/10/13.(mnfsl, )
February 19, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), filed on September 25, 2014, (Doc. 25 ), is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel is awarded an attorney's fee in the amount of $9,433 pur suant to 40 2U.S.C.§ 406(b). Upon receipt of the § 406(b) fee, Plaintiff's counsel shall refund to the Plaintiff the previously paid fee pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) in the amount of $6,500, by Judge John L. Kane on 02/19/2015. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca D. West
Represented By: Patrick C.H. Spencer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.