Muse v. RETS Tech Center, Inc.

Defendant: RETS Tech Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Muse
Case Number: 1:2012cv03182
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Request Call Records and Text Messages from AT&T, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2013.(rpmcd )
July 11, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 8/21/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 8/15/2013, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/11/2013. (rpmcd )
August 2, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 18 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/2/2013. (rpmcd )
January 8, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 1/8/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 20 , is granted with respect to Plaintiff's Breach of Contract and Breach of Implied Duty of Good Fai th and Fair Dealing, First and Second Claims for Relief, and denied with respect to plaintiff's Slander Per Se, Third Claim for Relief. Defendant's Motion to Strike 26 , is denied and the depositions of Annette Hernandez and those who attended the May 24th meeting are permitted. FTR: J. Hawkins. (rpmcd )
January 8, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR JUDGMENT DISMISSING FIRST AND SECOND CLAIMS FOR RELIEF re 20 : judgment will enter dismissing the first and second claims for relief, alleging breach of contract and breach of the implied duty of good faith and fair dealing, respectively, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/8/2014. (rpmcd)
February 5, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Final Pretrial Conference for 3/21/2014 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 13, 2014, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/5/2014. (rpmcd)
March 21, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 7/7/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/21/2014. (jsmit )
April 2, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settlement Conference set for 6/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/2/2014. (evana, )
December 5, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NONE on October 9, 2012. (johar, )
June 30, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/30/2014. (jsmit)
December 7, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/18/2013 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 10, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/7/2012. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muse v. RETS Tech Center, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETS Tech Center, Inc.
Represented By: Peter F. Munger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Muse
Represented By: Erin Casey Hogan
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]