Wilcox et al v. Panio et al

Plaintiff: Andrew DiPretoro and Jennifer Wilcox
Defendant: Carla Damicone, Jane Jordan, Edra Weiss, Whitney Harrah, Carol Olson, Alexander Panio, Jr., Mary Panio and Adolescent and Family Institute of Colorado, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv03183
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: Defendant Carol Olson's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), 16 filed in 12-cv-03183-RPM is denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/25/2013 in 4/25/2013 hearing in case 12-cv-02665-RPM (see page 2 of minutes).(rpmcd)
August 19, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 41(a)(2) (Carol Olson): Defendant Carol Olson is dismissed with prejudice from the above captioned case, with each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/19/2013. (rpmcd )
September 5, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/22/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 14, 2013 and lead counsel present. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar daysbefore the scheduling conference. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/5/2013. (rpmcd )
November 22, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STAY ORDER: all proceedings in this matter are stayed until further order of the Court, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/22/2013. (rpmcd)
July 2, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/2/2014. (jsmit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox et al v. Panio et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew DiPretoro
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wilcox
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Damicone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Jordan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edra Weiss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Harrah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Olson
Represented By: Barbara Hruby Glogiewicz
Represented By: Christopher Phillips Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Panio, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Panio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolescent and Family Institute of Colorado, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]