Bachofer v. Creany et al

Plaintiff: Baruch Bachofer
Defendant: Timothy Creany Jr., Tom Clements, Paula Frantz, Klenke, Angel Medina and Timothy (I) Creany Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03254
Filed: December 13, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/21/2012. (mjwcd)
January 7, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Bachofer's motion 18 is GRANTED, and his Motion For Preliminary Injunction And Request For Hearing 6 is WITHDRAWN fromthe record by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/07/13.(jjhsl, )
February 20, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 defendants' Opposed Motion to Vacate February 26, 2013 Preliminary Scheduling Conference and Stay of Discovery. Scheduling Conference 2/26/2013 09:00 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 3/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Motion is denied with respect to the request to stay discovery. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/20/2013.(mjwcd)
March 19, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 defendants' Opposed Motion to Stay March 22, 2013 Preliminary Scheduling Conference and Initial Disclosures Deadline for Amendment of Complaint or, Alternatively, to Appear by Phone. Defense counsel may participate by telephone. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/19/2013.(mjwcd)
May 20, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 30.2, as outlined in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/20/2013.(mjwcd)
July 15, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The tendered Amended Complaint (Docket No. 44-1) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/15/13.(jjhsl, )
July 15, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the CDOC Defendant' Motion To Dismiss 21 is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that Bachofers Motion To Strike Exhibits To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Discovery Pursuant To FRCP Rule 56(f) 27 is DENIED AS MOOT by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/15/13.(jjhsl, )
August 13, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 52 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify the Schedule Order with Respect to Designation of Expert Witnesses. Scheduling Order 35 is amended as to expert witness deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/13/2013.(mjwcd)
September 13, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Motion to Modify the Schedule Order with Respect to the Number of Expert Witnesses by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/13/13.(jjhsl, )
January 28, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 71 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Pretrial Conference and Reset After Resolution of the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 65 , as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2014.(mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bachofer v. Creany et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baruch Bachofer
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Creany Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Frantz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klenke
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Medina
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy (I) Creany Jr.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]