Early, v. Cochlear Americas Corporation

Plaintiff: Ryan F. Early
Defendant: Cochlear Americas Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03301
Filed: December 19, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2013 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/12/2013. (kmtcd)
May 30, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to pay his or its own costs and attorney fees by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/30/13. (jjhsl, )
January 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Early, v. Cochlear Americas Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan F. Early
Represented By: Bryan E. Kuhn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochlear Americas Corporation
Represented By: Charles William Weese, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]