Woods v. Tennyson Center for Children at Colorado Christian Home

Plaintiff: Donna Lyn Woods
Defendant: Tennyson Center for Children at Colorado Christian Home
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03325
Filed: December 21, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/12/13. (msksec, )
September 10, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order Regarding Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines and Request for Expedited Ruling. The discovery cut-off is extended to and including October 11, 2013, and the dispositive motion deadline is extended to and including November 12, 2013 (November 11, 2013 is a Court holiday). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference set for December 17, 2013, is vacated and reset to January 23, 2014, at 9:30 a.m., in C ourtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The proposed Pretrial Order, submitted pursuant to District of Colorado ECF Procedures V.5.1, is due on or before January 16, 2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/10/13. (alvsl)
September 16, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record. Colleen T. Calandra is granted leave to withdraw from the representation of plaintiff and is to be removed from the electronic service. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/16/13. (alvsl)
January 23, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a five-day Jury Trial for 9/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601, before Judge Raymond P. Moore, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/23/14. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 8/11/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore. (dkals, )
April 14, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for DISMISSAL with prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/14/2014. (trlee, )
January 17, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/4/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/17/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Woods v. Tennyson Center for Children at Colorado Christian Home
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lyn Woods
Represented By: Colleen Therise Calandra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennyson Center for Children at Colorado Christian Home
Represented By: Gregory Alan Eurich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]