Bunting v. Preferred Homecare

Defendant: Preferred Homecare
Plaintiff: Matthew Bunting
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03327
Filed: December 21, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/16/2013. (kmtcd)
March 12, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Non-Party Designations Doc. No. 13 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs motion to strike the nonparty designation of D.M.E. Solutions, Inc./Colorado Compressed Gases is DENIED. Plaintiffs motion to strike the nonparty designation of The Liquid Oxygen Repair Facility is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/12/2013.(ervsl, )
March 26, 2013 24 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 22 Defendants Motion to Reconsider Magistrate Order on Non-Party Designations. However, Defendant is granted an extension of time to and including May 21, 2013, for the sole purposes of (1) conducting discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 to determine the identity of the liquid oxygen repair facility and (2) filing a nonparty designation that complies with Colo. Rev. Stat. § 13-21-111.5(3)(b), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/26/2013.(ervsl, )
October 1, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER: It is ORDERED that "Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Amend His Civil Complaint and Jury Demand to Add Claims for Negligence Per Se and Exemplary Damages." (Doc. No. 28 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's motion to amend is DENIED as to his inherently dangerous activity claim and GRANTED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint, in conformity with this Order, on or before October 4, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/01/13. (alvsl)
January 27, 2014 72 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 56 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded its reasonable costs incurred in making the motion, including attorneys fees. Also awarded are the fees and extra expenses incurred, if any, to bring the matter to Plaintiff's expert's attention, as stated on record. Plaintiff is directed to file an itemization of co sts associated with the preparation and presentation of the motion, including the reply to the motion and the preparation of the itemization of costs, with the Court on or before February 3, 2014. Any objections to the reasonableness of the amounts claimed shall be filed on or before February 10, 2014. Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 62 is DENIED, for reasons stated on record. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
March 26, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/26/14: Defendant Preferred Home Care shall pay $3,637.58 as sanctions.(dkals, )
April 15, 2014 81 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/15/2014.(trlee, )
May 15, 2014 87 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/15/2014. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bunting v. Preferred Homecare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Homecare
Represented By: Robert J. McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bunting
Represented By: Jason William Jordan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]