Gresham et al v. Lobe

Plaintiff: Spencer (I) Gresham, Gretchen (I) Gresham, Gretchen Gresham and Spencer Gresham
Defendant: Thomas E. Lobe
Case Number: 1:2012cv03351
Filed: December 27, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by defendant Thomas E. Lobe, M.D., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/1/2013.(rpmcd)
February 20, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/27/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 21, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/20/2013. (rpmcd)
March 5, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER re: 17 and 19 resetting Scheduling Conference for 4/3/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed scheduling order must be submitted directly to chambers in paper form no later than 4:00 p.m. on March 28, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/5/2013. (rpmcd )
April 3, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 4/3/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Thom E. Lobe M.D.'s Designation of Nonparties 22 , is granted. Deadline for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of pleadings shall remain May 13, 2013. Counsel are to file a revised proposed scheduling order.FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
August 16, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each part to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees in this matter, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/16/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gresham et al v. Lobe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer (I) Gresham
Represented By: Derry Beach Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen (I) Gresham
Represented By: Derry Beach Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Gresham
Represented By: Derry Beach Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Gresham
Represented By: Derry Beach Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Lobe
Represented By: Christopher D. Yvars
Represented By: Patrick Quinn Hustead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]