Simmons v. Clements et al

Defendant: Andrea Wilson, Tom Clements and James Falk
Plaintiff: Leo Simmons
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03366
Filed: December 28, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motions and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 3 is denied. Mr. Simmons shall have thirty days from the date of th is Order to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee if he wishes to pursue his claims in this action. If Mr. Simmons fails to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee within the time allowed, the Complaint and the action will be dismissed without furt her notice. The only proper filing at this time is the payment of the $350.00 filing fee. ECF No 10 is a Response and not a Motion to Show Cause. The Clerk of the Court is directed to discharge the Motion, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/4/13. (sgrim)
June 19, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that the Complaint and the action are dismissed without prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/19/13. (mjgsl, )
June 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 18 Order of Dismissal. (mjgsl, )
January 9, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/09/2013. (sks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Simmons v. Clements et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Falk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]