USA v. $145,120.00 In United States Currency

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $145,120.00 In United States Currency
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00003
Filed: January 2, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/1/2013. (ervsl, )
August 28, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 the Governments Unopposed Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture. THAT judgment of forfeiture of $140,000.00 of defendant $145,120.00 in United States Currency shall enter in favor of the United States; THAT the United States shall have full and legal title to the forfeited property and may dispose of it in accordance with law and in accordance with the terms and provisions of the parties Settlement Agreement; and THAT a Certificate of Reasonable Cause, which this Order constitutes, is granted as to defendant $145,120.00 in United States Currency pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/28/2013.(ervsl, )
August 30, 2013 26 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA against $145,120.00 In United States Currency re: 25 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property; THAT judgment of forfeiture of $140,000.00 of defendant $145,120.00 in United States Currency shall enter in favor of the United States; THAT the United States shall have full and legal title to the forfeited property and may dispose of it in accordance with law and in accordance with the terms and provisions of the parties Settlement Agreement; and THAT a Certificate of Reasonable Cause, which this Order constitutes, is granted as to defendant $145,120.00 in United States Currency, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465. by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 8/30/2013. (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. $145,120.00 In United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: James Sandy Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $145,120.00 In United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]