Vianez v. Berkebile

Plaintiff: Juan Vianez
Defendant: D. Berkebile
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00028
Filed: January 4, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions, 4 and 6 , are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/22/13.(sgrim)
February 22, 2013 15 Featured Case JUDGMENT re: 14 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 2/22/13. (sgrim)
July 1, 2013 30 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking 29 Motion for Order for Release from Florence by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/1/13.(dkals, )
July 9, 2013 32 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking 31 Motion by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/9/13.(dkals, )
July 13, 2013 35 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking 33 Motion by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/13/13.(dkals, )
July 31, 2013 38 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking filings 36 and 37 by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/31/13.(dkals, )
January 10, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. ORDERED Plaintiff's request for production of documents 7 is denied as premature, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/10/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vianez v. Berkebile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Vianez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Berkebile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]