Blunk et al v. Fenton et al

Defendant: Colorado University, Lynne (I) Fenton and Lynne Fenton
Plaintiff: Chantel L. Blunk
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00080
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration on Motion to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference (Docket No. 10) is granted to the extent that the Scheduling Conference set on March 21, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET on May 8, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall file their proposed Scheduling Order on or before May 1, 2013 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/15/13.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 3/15/2013 to correct spelling error (jjhsl, ).
May 6, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion and Stipulation for Administrative Closure. This case will be administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 with leave to be reopened for good cause shown. In furtherance of the administrative closure, the parties are ordered to submit joint status reports to the Court every six months starting December 1, 2013 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/06/13.(jjhsl, )
January 16, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/16/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blunk et al v. Fenton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne (I) Fenton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Fenton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel L. Blunk
Represented By: Nicholus C. Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]