Moreno v. Qwest Corporation

Defendant: Qwest Corporation
Plaintiff: Dorene Moreno
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00103
Filed: January 16, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The Caption shall be amended to name Qwest Corporation as the Defendant. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/05/13. (alvsl)
May 24, 2013 28 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/24/2013. (mehcd)
June 5, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion to Strike Jury Demand, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/4/2013. (mehcd)
June 6, 2013 33 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Re-Set Status Conference. Status Conference reset for 6/14/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/6/2013. (mehcd)
January 17, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/17/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moreno v. Qwest Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth I. Kiovsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorene Moreno
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Represented By: Jessica Eve Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]