Mathison v. USA

Plaintiff: Eugene H. Mathison
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv00110
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/08/2013. (skl)
October 29, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the Surreply to AUSA Pestal's Reply for filing. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/13.(mnfsl, )
January 3, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion to Stay Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/3/14.(mnfsl, )
January 18, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/18/2013. (skl) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/18/2013) (skl).
February 24, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the Objection to Order by Magistrate Judge (Doc 45) 47 is OVERRULED and the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 33 is ACCEPTED. ORDERED that the United States Motion to Dismiss 21 filed by defendant the United States of America is DENIED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/24/14.(jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathison v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene H. Mathison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]