Reneau v. Mahoney

Plaintiff: Chester Lee Reneau
Defendant: Sasha (I) Mahoney
Case Number: 1:2013cv00125
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 17 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/18/2013.(ervsl, )
March 25, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 50 is ADOPTED IN FULL; Plaintiffs Objection ECF No. 51 is OVERRULED; Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 25 is DENIED; Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 28 is GRANTED; and The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant on all claims. Each party shall bear his or her own costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/25/2014.(evana, )
March 26, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Sasha Mahoney and against Plaintiff Chester Lee Reneau re: 53 , by Deborah Hansen, deputy clerk, on 3/26/2014. (dhans, )
January 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/25/12. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reneau v. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Lee Reneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasha (I) Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.