West v. Taylor, et al

Defendant: Robert Taylor, Marylou Robinson, Joel Richardson, Lacey, Clinton E. Averitte, Hill, Brain Thomas and Amarillo Police
Plaintiff: Donald Joseph West
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00150
Filed: January 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 11 Motion for Special Investigation into the Amarillo Police and Local State and Federal Courts, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/12/2013. Mr. West is directed to cease filing extraneous papers that do not cure these deficiencies.(skl)
March 7, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Transfer. ORDERED that the clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas (Amarillo), by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/7/13. (sgrim)
June 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 22 the motion that Plaintiff, Donald Joseph West, filed on June 13, 2014, asking this Court to return this transferred case to its docket. The clerk of the Court is directed to strike any future filings by Mr. West in this action. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/17/2014.(klyon, )
January 23, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/23/2013. (skl)
February 11, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 8 Motion Asking Court Again to Launch an Investigation by Outside Agency Into Attack and Severe Beating of Donald Joseph West, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/11/2013. Regarding 6 to the extent Mr. West requests free copies of any of the documents he has filed in this case, the request is DENIED. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: West v. Taylor, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marylou Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton E. Averitte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brain Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarillo Police
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Joseph West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]