Vanech v. Solis

Plaintiff: Jacqueline M. Vanech
Defendant: Hilda L. Solis and Seth Harris
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00168
Filed: January 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Disability)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 20 Featured Case Joint PROTECTIVE ORDER re 19 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2013. (rpmcd )
August 1, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 20 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2013. (rpmcd)
February 5, 2014 27 Featured Case Stay ORDER re 26 : The case is stayed until further order of the Court. If the case is not dismissed within 30 days from the date of this order, the parties shall file a status report, and the parties shall file a status report each 30 days thereafter until the case is dismissed or this order is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/5/2014. (rpmcd)
April 10, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/16/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 9, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/10/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vanech v. Solis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline M. Vanech
Represented By: Charlotte Noelle Sweeney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda L. Solis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Harris
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]