Sedaghaty v. Garcia

Respondent: Rene Garcia
Petitioner: Pirouz Sedaghaty
Case Number: 1:2013cv00194
Filed: January 25, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/06/2013. (skl)
April 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing this case without prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/4/13.(dkals, )
February 6, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/06/2013. (skl)
February 13, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 4 (Motion) Request for wife to be copied on all activity in this case, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/13/2013.(skl)
February 19, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/19/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sedaghaty v. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rene Garcia
Represented By: Juan Gonzalo Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pirouz Sedaghaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.