Washington v. Rhodes et al

Plaintiff: Marlon Washington
Defendant: M. Cundiff, Cozza Rhodes and Derrick Jones
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00197
Filed: January 25, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Amended Complaint and this action are DISMISSED. No certificate of appealability will issue. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/4/13. (sgrim)
April 4, 2013 11 Featured Case JUDGMENT re: 10 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 4/4/13. (sgrim)
January 29, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/29/13. (nmmsl, )
February 26, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, and denying as premature 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 02/26/13. (nmmsl, ) Modified on 2/26/2013 to correct the magistrate judge (skl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Washington v. Rhodes et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Cundiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cozza Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]