Hoeck v. Miklich et al

Plaintiff: David B. Hoeck
Defendant: Lance Miklich, Ted Stenzel, Darryl Proffit, Matt Winden, Mary Toomey and Linda Worthen
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00206
Filed: January 28, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to District Judge and to Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Defendants Clements, Timme, DeCesaro and Machin are DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that the claims against Defendants Miklich, Stenzel, Proffit, Winden, Toomey and Worthen shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/18/13. (sgrim)
June 4, 2013 24 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [#22-1] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. Defendants who have already been served and entered their appeara nces in this case shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs'Second Amended Complaint [#22-1] on or before 6/28/2013. The CDOC Executive Director, Rae Timme, Tony Decesaro, and Kirk Machin have already been dismissed from this lawsuit on 3/18/2013. Plaintiff may not simply add defendants to his Second Amended Complaint once they have already been dismissed. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/4/13.(mnfsl, )
December 5, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 35 RECOMMENDATION. Defendants' 28 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Prisoner Complaint is granted. This case and the claims contained therein are dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/5/13.(mnfsl, )
December 12, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 38 Motion for Opportunity to Respond to Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. The 36 Order Accepting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation and the 37 Final Judgment are vacated and this case is reopened. Plaintiff shall file objections to the Recommendation on or before Friday, 12/27/2013. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/12/13.(mnfsl, )
February 19, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Docket No. 35 is ADOPTED in part. It is further ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss Docket No. 28 filed by defendants Lance Miklich, Ted Stenzel, Darryl Proffit, Mary Toomey, Linda Worthen, Scott Lancaster, Tom Jordan, Valarie Craig, Ken Topliss, J. Stricklett, and Mary Ann Aldrich is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/19/2014.(evana, )
January 31, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/31/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hoeck v. Miklich et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Hoeck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Miklich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Stenzel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Proffit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Winden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Toomey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Worthen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]