USA v. $19,712.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $19,712.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Dan Jensen
Plaintiff: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00219
Filed: January 29, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/3/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/26/13. (sgrim)
December 16, 2013 37 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. United States' Motion for Order Determining Potential Conflict of Interest 33 is GRANTED. The Court finds Mr. Willett is disqualified as counsel for claimant Dan Jensen due to his conflict of interest in representing Mr. Gerhardt in the criminal case. The disqualification of Mr. Willett shall be effective on January 6, 2014. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
February 13, 2014 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 38 Motion for Final Forfeiture of Property; THAT forfeiture of $16,712.00 of defendant $19,712.00 shall enter in favor of the United States; the United States shall have full and legal title to the defendant property, and may dispose of it in accordance with law and in accordance with the terms and provisions of the parties Settlement Agreement, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/13/2014.(evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. $19,712.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,712.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dan Jensen
Represented By: Jonathan S. Willett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Represented By: James Sandy Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]