Villatoro v. Berkebile

Petitioner: Erwin Villatoro
Respondent: David Berkebile
Case Number: 1:2013cv00239
Filed: January 30, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Application is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/23/13. (sgrim)
April 23, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re: 14 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 4/23/13. (sgrim)
January 31, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/31/13. (nmmsl, )
March 5, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/05/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villatoro v. Berkebile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erwin Villatoro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Berkebile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]