Scarbrough v. Coleman Company, Inc., The

Plaintiff: Kyle Scarbrough
Defendant: Coleman Company, Inc., The
Case Number: 1:2013cv00260
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 22 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/3/2013. (mehcd)
July 24, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Defendant Coleman's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Claims for Relief and Memorandum in Support. Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Claims for Relief are dismissed, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/24/2013. (eseam)
December 12, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the 39 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/12/2013. (eseam)
March 4, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Standing Order for any Settlement Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/4/2013. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarbrough v. Coleman Company, Inc., The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Scarbrough
Represented By: David W. Krivit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman Company, Inc., The
Represented By: Peter C. Middleton
Represented By: Darin James Lang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]