Anderson v. Healthcare Services Group, Inc. et al

Defendant: Andrew Yandt, Aaron Church, Healthcare Services Group, Inc. and Ken Cope
Plaintiff: Samantha Anderson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00280
Filed: February 3, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000a Title II Civil Rights Act 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/19/13. (cbssec)
January 29, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2014. ORDERED: 44 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent the discovery deadline is extended to 3/17/2014 and the dispositive motion deadline is extended to 3/28/2014. The Motion to Extend is DENIED to the extent it seeks an extension of 60 days. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
March 27, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/27/14. (dkals, )
February 26, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/19/2013 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/26/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Healthcare Services Group, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Yandt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Church
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Services Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cope
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Anderson
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]