Johnston v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Johnston
Case Number: 1:2013cv00287
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Motions : plaintiff's motion to supplement administrative record, filed May 29, 2013, 9 is granted and the defendant's motion for remand for further administrative proceedings and to stay this case pending completion of the administrative review, filed June 18, 2013, 13 is denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/15/2013.(rpmcd )
July 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Dismiss ERISA Penalty Claim: All claims for violation of ERISA statutory penalties asserted by Plaintiff in his Complaint are dismissed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/15/2013.(rpmcd)
July 25, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Withdraw and Withdrawing [14 ] Motion to Compel, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/25/2013.(rpmcd )
September 20, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice, each party to pay his and its own attorney fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/20/2013. (rpmcd )
March 27, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING RULE 16 PROCEDURE - ERISA: Joint Statement due by 4/29/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/27/2013. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Johnston
Represented By: Michael Scott Krieger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]