Supply Network, Inc. v. M.A. Mortenson et al

Defendant: Robert Coonts, M.A. Mortenson Company, Federal Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Plaintiff: Supply Network, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00324
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/20/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (kfinn, )
June 3, 2013 25 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/3/13. (msksec, )
August 20, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing Claims Against Defendant. Motion to Dismiss Defendant RobertCoonts (Motion) (# 30 ) is granted and and all claims asserted byPlaintiff against Defendant Robert Coonts are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All future captions shall so reflect. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/20/2013.(klyon, )
September 25, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. The Stipulated Motion to Dismiss (# 32 ) is GRANTED and all claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendants are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own attorney fees and costs. To the extent the Motion requests that counsel be permitted to withdraw,the Motion is DENIED with leave to re-file in compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 83.3. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/25/2013.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Supply Network, Inc. v. M.A. Mortenson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Coonts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. Mortenson Company
Represented By: Michael Ennio Bonifazi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Ennio Bonifazi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Michael Ennio Bonifazi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supply Network, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Glade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]