Jenkins v. Duffy Crane and Hauling, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Franklyn A. Jenkins
Defendant: Duffy Crane and Hauling, Inc., Duffy Holdings, LLC and Duffy Crane, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00327
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Amended Motion to Dismiss, and denying as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/20/13.(dkals, )
January 29, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 39 Joint Motion to Modify Initial Disclosure Deadline by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/14.(dkals, )
September 2, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 62 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Discovery due by 11/26/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET to 1/21/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/02/2014. (athom, )
November 13, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER granting 70 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Leave. Discovery Cut-Off 1/30/2015. Dispositive Motions Deadline 2/16/2015. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/15 at 10:00 AM is Vacated and RESET to 3/30/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. The proposed pretrial order shall be submitted on or before 3/23/2015. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/13/2014. (athom, )
January 29, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/15. Renewed Motion to Amend Case Management Order for Extension of Deadline for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings [#68] is DENIED without prejudice.(lgale, )
January 29, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/15. Third Stipulated Motion to Amend the Case Management Order [#80] is GRANTED. Discovery due by 5/15/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for March 30, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 6/29/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/22/2015. (lgale, )
March 24, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are to file additional briefing on the limited issue of whether the Colorado Supreme Court would adopt the Savage rule or apply comparative fault to the facts of this case. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/24/2015. (athom, )
February 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 5/21/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/12/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Duffy Crane and Hauling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklyn A. Jenkins
Represented By: Neil A. Hillyard
Represented By: Michael Lee Nimmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duffy Crane and Hauling, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Matthew Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duffy Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Matthew Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duffy Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Matthew Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]