Lyons v. Southwest Memorial Hospital

Defendant: Southwest Memorial Hospital
Plaintiff: Charles M. Lyons
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00328
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Montezuma
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Disability)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/18/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/10/13. (sgrim)
September 23, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiff's re: 40 First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) is stricken. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/23/13. (mnfsl, )
March 17, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Original Complaint. Denying as moot 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Denying as moot 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Denying as moot 51 Plaintiff's Second Request Motion to Request the Court to Appoint Pro Se Plaintiff Legal Counsel Representation. This case is dismissed in its entirety, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/17/2014. (eseam)
March 17, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant, Southwest Memorial Hospital and against Plaintiff, Charles M. Lyons pursuant to the 53 Order, by Clerk on 3/17/2014. (eseam)
February 11, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/11/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lyons v. Southwest Memorial Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Memorial Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M. Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]