Brading v. Ken Caryl Ranch Metropolitan District

Defendant: Ken Caryl Ranch Metropolitan District
Plaintiff: Carey Brading
Case Number: 1:2013cv00349
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/3/13. (msksec, )
May 13, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/13/13. (cbssec)
July 1, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/1/14.(dkals, )
March 4, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING. Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 3/29/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/4/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brading v. Ken Caryl Ranch Metropolitan District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Caryl Ranch Metropolitan District
Represented By: Kristin R. Anderson
Represented By: Cathy Havener Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Brading
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hasselbacher
Represented By: Diane Smith King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.