Gonzales et al v. Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company, Inc. and Kroger Co., The
Plaintiff: Pamela (I) Gonzales and Pamela Gonzales
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00441
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 9 defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 4/16/2013 09:30 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/11/2013.(mjwcd)
October 16, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. October 25, 2013 - deadline for filing of motion to supplement the administrative record; (2) November 22, 2013 - deadline for Gonzales opening brief; (3) December 13, 2013 - deadline for the response brief of Kroger and MetLife; and (4) January 3, 2014 - deadline for Gonzales reply brief. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/16/2013.(trlee, )
February 22, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/22/13. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gonzales et al v. Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co., The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela (I) Gonzales
Represented By: David Patrick Reiter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Gonzales
Represented By: David Patrick Reiter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]