Gares v. Siler et al

Defendant: New World Van, Inc. and Dennis Siler
Plaintiff: Amy Gares
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00468
Filed: February 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. Scheduling Conference reset for 5/20/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/1/13. (sgrim)
May 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/18/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 8/4/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/17/13. (rebsec, )
May 15, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 47 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court RECOMMENDS th at Judge Blackburn advises the jury that the exhibit currently labeled Exhibit R to Defendants Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 47 was wilfully withheld until after the close of discovery by Plaintiff. Discovery cut-off is extended until July 1, 2014. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
July 10, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice [# 60 ] filed July 10, 2014, is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/10/2014. (klyon, )
February 27, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/27/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gares v. Siler et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New World Van, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Lee Beam
Represented By: Cash K. Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Siler
Represented By: Cash K. Parker
Represented By: Thomas Lee Beam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Gares
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Petis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]