Rackhouse Pub, LLC v. Proximo Spirits, Inc. et al

Defendant: Proximo Distillers, LLC, Proximo Spirits, Inc., Stranahan's Colorado Whiskey, LLC, S-Kalamath, LLC and Stranahanskalamath, LLC
Plaintiff: Rackhouse Pub, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00477
Filed: February 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2013 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/12/2013. (kmtcd)
May 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. Scheduling Conference reset for 5/20/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/1/13. (sgrim)
May 6, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Rackhouse's motion 18 is DENIED. The Court further finds that Proximo removed this action on diversity grounds, contending that the Stranahan De fendants were fraudulently joined. Rackhouse has neither sought remand of the case due to lack of complete diversity (if it believes its claims against the Stranahan Defendants remain viable) nor dismissed the claims against the Stranahan Defendants. Indeed, it is not entirely clear to the Court whether the Stranahan Defendants have been served in this matter. Accordingly, within 21 days of this Order, Rackhouse shall SHOW CAUSE, inwriting, why the claims against the Stranahan Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim and failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 5/28/2013. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/5/13.(msksec, )
May 21, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/21/13. (msksec, )
September 16, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/16/2013. (kmtcd)
October 11, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 37 Motion to Remand to State Court. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/11/13.(msklc2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rackhouse Pub, LLC v. Proximo Spirits, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proximo Distillers, LLC
Represented By: Jonathon David Bergman
Represented By: Benjamin Blake Strawn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proximo Spirits, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathon David Bergman
Represented By: Benjamin Blake Strawn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stranahan's Colorado Whiskey, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S-Kalamath, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stranahanskalamath, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rackhouse Pub, LLC
Represented By: Larry A. Henning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]