Bruce et al v. Wilson, et al

Defendant: F. Cordova, A. Osagie, C. Wilson and Y. Fetterhoff
Plaintiff: Antoine Bruce
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00491
Filed: February 25, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that Mr. Pinson is dismissed from this action. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to use ECF Nos 1 and 9 to open a new action on Mr. Pinson's behalf dated February 25, 2013. Mr. Bruce is directed to file an Amended Comp laint in this action that asserts only his claims against named Defendants. If within thirty days of the date of this Order Mr. Bruce fails to comply with this Order and file an Amended Prisoner Complaint the Court will dismiss the action without further notice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/21/13. (sgrim)
April 22, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/22/2013. (skl)
July 29, 2013 42 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Preliminary Scheduling Conference held on 7/29/2013. 29 Motion to Withdraw from a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction is DENIED. 36 Motion Reque sting Plaintiff's Body to be Photographed is DENIED. The court states no discovery deadlines shall be set until Mr. Bruce files his Response to the Motion to Dismiss at which time the court will be in a better position to know to what extent the case is moving forward. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
February 26, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/26/2013. (skl)
November 4, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 52 Report and Recommendations.granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/4/2013.(trlee, )
March 12, 2013 8 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 7 Motion Requesting Copies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/12/2013.(skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bruce et al v. Wilson, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Cordova
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Osagie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Fetterhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Bruce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]