Aguilar v. Tamme, et al

Respondent: Rae Tamme and Colorado State Attorney General
Petitioner: Antonio Aguilar
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00494
Filed: February 25, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/03/2013. (skl)
July 12, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denied without prejudice as premature 18 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; denied without prejudice 19 Motion For a Stay, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/12/2013.(skl)
August 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/26/2013. (skl)
August 28, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss in Part. The amended motion for a stay (ECF No. 22 ) is DENIED. Claims one, two, three, and eight in the Application are DISMISSEDbecause those claims are unexhausted and procedurally barred. Within thirty days Respondents are dire cted to file an answer in compliance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases that fully addresses the merits of the remaining claims. Within thirty days of the filing of the answer Applicant may file a reply, if he desires. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/28/2013. (klyon, )
August 28, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For State Court Record. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/28/2013. (klyon, )
September 25, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Applicant's renewed motion for a stay (ECF No. 29 ) and motion forappointment of counsel (ECF No. 31 ) are DENIED. Applicant's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 30 ) is GRANTED and Applicant shall have up to and including 11/1/2013, to file a reply to Respondents' Answer to Application. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/25/2013.(klyon, )
February 26, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/26/2013. (skl)
April 2, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 5 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; denying as premature 6 (Motion) Request for Stay and Abeyance; denying as moot 1 [Motion for] Extension [sic] of Time to File Habeas Corpus, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/02/2013.(skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Aguilar v. Tamme, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rae Tamme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado State Attorney General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Aguilar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]