Harrell v. Bromley East Charter School et al

Defendant: Bromley East Charter School, Inc. and Bromley East Charter School
Plaintiff: Roberta Harrell
Case Number: 1:2013cv00511
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/9/2013 02:30 PM before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 3, 2013. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/21/2013. (ervsl, )
July 3, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 Notice of Settlement: the scheduling conference set for July 9, 2013, at 2:30 p.m. and the deadline to submit a proposed scheduling order are vacated. Dismissal Paper due by 8/2/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/3/2013. (rpmcd)
August 19, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Bromley East Charter School are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear their own attorneys fees and costs as agreed between the parties, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/19/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. Bromley East Charter School et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bromley East Charter School, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Dawn Campbell
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bromley East Charter School
Represented By: Heather Dawn Campbell
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Harrell
Represented By: Karen Ellen Ford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]