Gordon v. Rice

Defendant: Donald Rice
Plaintiff: Deanna Gordon
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00514
Filed: February 27, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a seven-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on July 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for May 22, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/15/2013. (rbjsec. )
December 17, 2013 36 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 34 Motion for Order; denying 35 Motion to Compel (public entry for 29 -restricted document). by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/17/2013.(trlee, )
March 7, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER TO DETERMINE PRIVILEGE re: 37 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Discovery In Camera Review. To the extent Defendant's motion seeks an order compelling production of the documents produced to this Court in camera, the motion is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in the attached document. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/7/2014. (mehcd)
March 4, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/04/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gordon v. Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Rice
Represented By: Craig William Cain
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Gordon
Represented By: Cornell Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]