Marshall v. Exelis Systems Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Rashanna Marshall
Defendant: Exelis Systems Corporation, Exelis, Inc. and Lawrence Lindloff
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00545
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 47 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Exelis Systems Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1981 and Outrageous Conduct Claims (Doc. # 47 ) is DENIED IN PART with respect to its arguments regarding Plaintiff's outrageous conduct claim. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/26/2014. (athom, )
June 7, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Partially Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Jury Demand by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/7/13.(dkals, )
August 9, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/9/13. (sgrim)
March 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/8/2013. (kmtcd)
March 24, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), and granting in part 47 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1981 and Outrageous Conduct Claims, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/24/14.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marshall v. Exelis Systems Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashanna Marshall
Represented By: Jessica Eve Jones
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer
Represented By: Mari Anne Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelis Systems Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Chilcoat
Represented By: Glenn H. Schlabs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelis, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Chilcoat
Represented By: Glenn H. Schlabs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Lindloff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]