Echenique v. Goodwill, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ivette T. Echenique
Defendant: Goodwill, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00556
Filed: March 4, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 5/13/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/19/2013. (mjwcd)
May 9, 2013 15 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion...to Appear by Telephone. Plaintiff may participate by telephone for 5/13/2013 09:30 AM Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/9/2013.(mjwcd)
May 13, 2013 24 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/13/2013. 20 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify is DENIED. Scheduling Conference, Status Conference and Show Cause hearing set for 7/9/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. FTR: Patricia Glover. (mskcd)
July 9, 2013 33 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference/ Show Cause Hearing / Status Conference held on 7/9/2013. Order to Show Cause 23 is deemed satisfied and is discharged. Grant ing 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Case Caption and Defandants [sic] on Previously Submitted Complaint. Withdrawing, with leave to re-file, 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in theAlternative, Motion for More Definite Statement. Discovery due by 12/10/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/3/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Parties shall file the Scheduling Order in its final form for the Court's signature on or before 7/16/2013, nunc pro tunc 7/9/2013. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
November 4, 2013 48 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Defendant Goodwill Industries of Denver's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Appear in Colorado for Depositions. Defendant shall advise the court in writing of the date and time set for the deposition of plaintiff, which shall be set on or before November 28, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/4/2013.(mjwcd)
December 5, 2013 53 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Defendants First Set of Discovery. Pro Se Plaintiff shall provide to Defendant responses to Defendant's First Set of Discovery on or before December 30, 2013. Each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/5/13.(mnfsl, )
December 11, 2013 56 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order toExtend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference remains set on 3/10/2014, at 9:00 a.m. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/11/2013.(klyon, )
April 5, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/05/13. (nmmsl, )
February 4, 2014 64 Featured Case ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 61 RECOMMENDATION. Defendant's 51 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute is granted. Defendant's 41 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement is denied as moot. This case and the claims contained therein are dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/4/14.(mfiel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Echenique v. Goodwill, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivette T. Echenique
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]