Roberts v. Antonio et al

Defendant: Marc Antonio, Tim Dooley and Town of Vail, The
Plaintiff: Chazz J. Roberts
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00582
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2013. 13 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Discovery due by 1/24/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/24/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FTR: Courtroom A402 - Courtni Covington. (ccovi)
January 23, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2014. ORDERED: 31 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is DENIED as moot. The parties are directed to file a stipulated motion to dismiss on or before January 31, 2014. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
March 17, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, with the parties to pay their own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/17/2014. (evana, )
March 18, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/28/2013 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/18/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roberts v. Antonio et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Antonio
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Dooley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Vail, The
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chazz J. Roberts
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]