Martinez v. Town of LaSalle et al

Defendant: Town of LaSalle, Colorado, LaSalle Police Department and Sam Johnson
Plaintiff: Modesto Martinez, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00588
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/12/2013 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room, The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 5, 2013, and lead counsel present in person. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/26/2013. (rpmcd)
October 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER re 14 : proposed scheduling order and the October 10,2013, scheduling conference are vacated and Dismissal Paper due by 10/25/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/4/2013.(rpmcd)
October 28, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/28/2013. (rpmcd)
July 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Defendants' 7 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: this civil action is dismissed as to the Town of LaSalle, Colorado, and the second claim for relief is dismissed as to Defendant Sam Johnson. This case will go forward on the first claim for relief against the Defendant Sam Johnson, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/25/2013.(rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Town of LaSalle et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of LaSalle, Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesto Martinez, Jr.
Represented By: Sherri Arleen Murgallis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]