Biola-Kelly v. Target Corporation

Plaintiff: Celeste Biola-Kelly
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00593
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's First and Third Claims for Relief Pursuant to 15 Stipulation filed by Celeste Biola-Kelly. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/26/13. (alvsl)
May 9, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Civil Case Terminated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/09/13. (alvsl)
March 13, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/13/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biola-Kelly v. Target Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Biola-Kelly
Represented By: Richard James Hull
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Represented By: Marianne Laborde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]