Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.98.8

Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.98.8
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00641
Filed: March 11, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER; Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/21/2013.(klmcd, )
July 31, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/31/13. (jjhsl, )
March 13, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference; Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klmcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.98.8
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.98.8
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]