Tennyson v. Carpenter et al

Defendant: Tom Clements, Kit Carson Correctional Center, Robert Sparks, Robert (I) Sparks, Vance Everett, Matthew Carpenter, Vance (I) Everett, Matthew (I) Carpenter, Colorado Department of Corrections and Tom (I) Clements
Plaintiff: Audrey Lee Tennyson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00648
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/02/2013. (skl)
May 1, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Objection. ORDERED that the objection titled Objections/Motion for Reconsideration of Orders [sic] Dated 4/2/2013" 11 is overruled. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Tennyson will be allowed thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to file an amended prisoner complaint that complies with the order of April 2, 2013. Failure to do so within the time allowed will result in the dismissal of the instant action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/1/13. (sgrim)
June 19, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/19/13 DENYING as unnecessary 17 Motion for Leave To File Amended Complaint in Excess of 30 pages; DENYING as premature 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and DENYING 21 Request for a free copy of docket sheet. (nmmsl, )
June 21, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/21/13. (dkals, )
July 11, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/11/13.(dkals, )
May 7, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reinstating Case. This civil action is reinstated pursuant to the Order and Judgment of the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit filed on March 18, 2014 (ECF No. 35 ), and the Tenth Circuit mandate filed on April 16, 2014 (ECF No. 37 ). The case shall be reassigned to the pro se docket. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/7/2014. (klyon, )
May 13, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if, appropriate, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/13/2014. (smoor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennyson v. Carpenter et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kit Carson Correctional Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sparks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) Sparks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Everett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance (I) Everett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew (I) Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom (I) Clements
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Lee Tennyson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]