Kazazian v. Emergency Service Physicians, P.C. et al

Defendant: Emergency Service Physicians, P.C., Jeffrey Law Office, P.C., Laura (I) E. Shapiro, Brian Jeffrey, Law Office Laura E. Shapiro, P.C., ADP Total Source, Inc., Christina Johnson, Kenneth Rooks, Laura E Shapiro, Stephen C. Hulet, Hulet & Associates, P.C., Stephen (I) C. Hulet and Brian (I) Jeffrey
Plaintiff: Nina H. Kazazian
Case Number: 1:2013cv00669
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Status Conference held on 5/13/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave for Substitute Service of Process on Defendant Stackpool Through His Counsel, Henry Solano 40 is G RANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted insofaras Defendant Stackpool is deemed to have been properly served through his attorney. It is denied as to the award of the attorneys fees and costs incurred in connection with the servi ce attempts on Defendant Stackpool. ORDERED: Joint Motion for May 22, 2013 as the Pleading Response Date for all Defendants Other than McCune and Kennedy Childs 50 is GRANTED. Answers or other responsive pleadings are due from all defendants who h ave been served are due on or before May 22, 2013. All other dates contained in the Order Setting Scheduling Conference remain in effect. ORDERED: A Rule 26(f) meeting between all parties will occur on May 14, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. ORDERED: Mr. Lessman will provide a definitive answer to Ms. Kazazian with respect to her request for continuation of COBRA benefits paperwork by May 15, 2013.FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
March 20, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/20/2013. (kmtcd)
March 27, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants Kennedy Childs, P.C. and Daniel McCune, Esq.s Motion for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to Colo. Rev. Stat. § 13-17-102 and 28 U.S.C. § 1927 71 is DENIED. ORDERED that Defendants Laura E. Shapiro and Law Offices of Laura E. Shapiro P.C.'s Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to § 13-17-102, C.R.S. and 28 U.S.C. § 1927 72 is DENIED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/27/14.(jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kazazian v. Emergency Service Physicians, P.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Service Physicians, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Law Office, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura (I) E. Shapiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Jeffrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office Laura E. Shapiro, P.C.
Represented By: Daniel Ray McCune
Represented By: Margrit Alice Lent Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADP Total Source, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Rooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura E Shapiro
Represented By: Daniel Ray McCune
Represented By: Margrit Alice Lent Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Hulet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hulet & Associates, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen (I) C. Hulet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian (I) Jeffrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina H. Kazazian
Represented By: Nina H. Kazazian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]