Thompsons Film, LLC, The v. Does 1-94

Plaintiff: Thompsons Film, LLC, The
Defendant: John Does 1-94
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00687
Filed: March 14, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 5/2/2013, denying without prejudice 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. FTR: C. Pearson - Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
May 29, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 21 the Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by John Doe 2/5, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/29/2013. (mehcd)
August 20, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER striking 32 Motion for an Order Entering Consent Decree and Dismissal With Prejudice by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/20/13.(jjhsl, )
August 20, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/20/13.(jjhsl, )
September 10, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/10/2013. (mehcd)
September 16, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Name Doe Defendant. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Third Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief, found at docket [50-1]. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/16/2013. (mehcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thompsons Film, LLC, The v. Does 1-94
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompsons Film, LLC, The
Represented By: David John Stephenson, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-94
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]