Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp. v. CML&J, LLC

Defendant: CML&J, LLC
Plaintiff: Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00695
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0101 (35:101 Patent Infringement)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR BRIEFING ON MARKMAN ISSUES. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/22/13. (kfinn, )
June 27, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 12(b)(2) and (b)(3). Defendant CML&J's Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) [#13], filed 4/18/2013, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED ASMOOT IN PART. Plaintiff's claims against defendant are DISMISSED WITHOUTPREJUDICE. Judgment without prejudice SHALL ENTER. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/27/2013. (klyon, )
June 28, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of CML&J, LLC against Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp. re: 23 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Clerk on 6/28/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp. v. CML&J, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CML&J, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp.
Represented By: Ryan James Fletcher
Represented By: Peter A. Gergely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]