Zasopiar v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Bonnie A. Zasopiar
Case Number: 1:2013cv00711
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/3/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 10/2/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 10/17/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 8/29/13. (mnfsl, )
November 25, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Remand. The Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with a remand of the cause to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/25/13.(mnfsl, )
November 25, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 22 Order. By Clerk on 11/25/13. (mnfsl, )
January 22, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 26 The Stipulated (Motion for Attorney) Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $3,473.56. By Judge John L. Kane on 1/22/14.(mfiel, )
March 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/25/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zasopiar v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie A. Zasopiar
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]