MacDougall v. Manpowergroup US, Inc. and IBM Corporation

Defendant: ManpowerGroup US, Inc. and IBM Corporation
Plaintiff: Allison MacDougall
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00734
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/22/2013. Denying 18 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 26 Motion for Leave. Discovery due by 1/22/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2014. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/20/2014 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2014 9:00 AM in Courtroom A902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
July 23, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for June 20, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/23/2013. (rbjsec. )
August 5, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Agreed Protective ORDER (granting 33 Motion for Protective Order). By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/05/13. (alvsl)
January 17, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/17/14. (rbjcd, )
March 21, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL: Clerk of Court shall reassign this civil action, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/21/2013. (rpmcd)
March 26, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/26/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MacDougall v. Manpowergroup US, Inc. and IBM Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ManpowerGroup US, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Colin Cooper
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison MacDougall
Represented By: Timothy Michael Kratz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]