Thompson et al v. Maxfield & Oberton Holdings LLC

Plaintiff: Stephanie Thompson and Stephanie (I) Thompson
Defendant: Maxfield & Oberton Holdings LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00751
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Pursue Substituted Service on Craig Zucker. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/17/14.(rbjcd, )
October 6, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Settlement and vacating hearing. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/6/14. (jdyne, )
April 2, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/02/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Maxfield & Oberton Holdings LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Thompson
Represented By: Kevin Michael McGreevy
Represented By: Paul Joseph Komyatte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie (I) Thompson
Represented By: Kevin Michael McGreevy
Represented By: Paul Joseph Komyatte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxfield & Oberton Holdings LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]